THE IAN KARTEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objective of the trust is the establishment of special centres which give adults with severe disabilities access to assistive computer technology for vocational and life skills training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 January 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD COPISAROW | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|||||
SALLY ELIZABETH COOKE | Trustee | 29 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA MORAN | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY DAVIS | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £410.47k | £430.18k | £454.72k | £447.59k | £465.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £434.07k | £357.46k | £399.25k | £428.25k | £447.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH DECEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
TO CARRY OUT SUCH LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OR RELIGION OR OTHERWISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SELECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
International House
64 Nile Street
LONDON
N1 7SR
- Phone:
- 07720931477
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window