THE NHIC EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes awareness through publicity and education on all matters relating to maintaining and improving residential property. Encourages the better use of homes by stimultaing activity by householders, the industry, local authories and Government departments.Complements the activities of The National Home Improvement Council
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 January 1981: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander William MacGregor | Chair | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Elizabeth MacEachern | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Neville Smith | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Orrill | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lester William David Corney | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Frank Bernard Whitefoot | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.19k | £4.11k | £4.10k | £4.07k | £4.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £92 | £5 | £33 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST DECEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE (SEE TRUST DEED FOR FURTHER DETAILS).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 9
Clarence House
212 New London Road
Chelmsford
CM2 9AE
- Phone:
- 01245264664
- Email:
- trustee@nhic.org.uk
- Website:
-
nhic.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window