BISHOP'S STORTFORD DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the understanding and appreciation of the decorative and fine arts through a series of public lectures and with visits to relevant exhibitions, museums, galleries and historic houses. Also by giving grants to schools to encourage arts activities and the spread of knowledge about art and artists with an emphasis on involvement in practical projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 11 February 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HILARY MATHEWS | Chair | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JANE CHAPMAN | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY JEAN MOORE | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAMES CHRISTOPHER BARRIE | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Hugh Jones | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET SIMONS | Trustee | 17 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARY SAVAGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM RONALD SAVAGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.04k | £11.94k | £15.99k | £21.16k | £27.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.57k | £10.52k | £18.08k | £21.02k | £24.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 NOVEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 7 DECEMBER 1999, 14 NOVEMBER 2000 AND 11 NOVEMBER 2008. as amended on 14 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND THE CULTIVATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 MAZE GREEN ROAD
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
CM23 2PJ
- Phone:
- 01279656065
- Email:
- green.da@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window