Governing document BISHOP'S STORTFORD DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY
Charity number: 281725

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 NOVEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 7 DECEMBER 1999, 14 NOVEMBER 2000 AND 11 NOVEMBER 2008. as amended on 14 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND THE CULTIVATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.