Accounts and annual returns THE MOUNT EDGCUMBE HOSPICE LIMITED

Charity Number: 281746
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 10 April 2008 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 17 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 30 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 28 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 05 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 05 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 01 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 25 November 2004 On Time