HERMES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hermes Trust makes grants and loans to cultural, educational, medical and other charitable projects inspired by Rudolf Steiner's anthroposophy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Germany
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Switzerland
Governance
- 29 January 1982: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL FULLER | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|||||
JEREMY SMITH | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Michael Balcombe | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jonas | Trustee | 28 October 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £268.42k | £103.89k | £157.17k | £110.59k | £145.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £185.75k | £116.94k | £204.23k | £153.32k | £186.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH DECEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE DOCTRINE OF ANTHROPOSOPHY THAT IS TO SAY THE SPIRITUAL SCIENCE WHICH FORMED THE SUBJECT MATTER OF THE WRITINGS AND TEACHINGS OF DR RULDOPH STEINER, AND TO PROMOTE ITS APPLICATION IN THE FIEDS OF EDUCATION, THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, MEDICINE, RELIGION, PHILOSOPHY, SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT AND WELFARE, ARICULTURE AND OTHERWISE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL AND MORAL IMPROVEMENTOF HUMAN BEINGS WITH OR WITHOUT SUCH RESERVATIONS, AMENDMENTS, ADDITIONS AND OMISSIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DEEM PROPER AND RELIEF OF THE AGED, SICK AND POOR IN WAY WHICH MAY FRON TIME TO TIME BE CHARITABLE AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLPURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS RESOLVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hermes Trust
Old Painswick Inn
Gloucester Street
STROUD
GL5 1QG
- Phone:
- 01453763900
- Email:
- hermes.trust@freeuk.com
- Website:
-
hermes-trust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window