LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF WEYMOUTH AND PORTLAND HOSPITALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve patients & former patients of our hospitals & other invalids in the community who are sick, convalescent & disabled, handicapped, infirm or in need of financial assistance & generally, to support the charitable work of the said hospitals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 03 February 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER RENDALL | Chair | 11 November 2016 |
|
|||||
STUART RITCHIE MCGOWAN | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Dyer | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Gallery | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Fry | Trustee | 14 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Anthony Fry | Trustee | 14 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANN RENDALL | Trustee | 11 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA DONNISON | Trustee | 11 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
DEREK WILLIAMS | Trustee | 11 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARYLIN PETTIFER | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
CYRIL FORD | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA BEATRICE REEVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID PRESTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.49k | £9.24k | £4.00k | £3.53k | £1.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.42k | £3.95k | £696 | £3.25k | £13.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH DECEMBER 1980, AS AMENDED 15/5/96
Charitable objects
SHALL BE TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE WEYMOUTH AND PORTLAND HOSPITALS WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL(S).
Area of benefit
WEYMOUTH AND PORTLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Sandbourne Road
WEYMOUTH
DT3 6QG
- Phone:
- 01305834014
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window