NORFOLK AND SUFFOLK AVIATION MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Museum has been run by volunteers since 1972 and owns its 8-acre site. There is no admission charge and 22,000 visitors pa view 60 aircraft plus over 45,000 aviation artefacts displayed in hangars and themed buildings. Aviation history in the eastern counties predominates in the collection. School and Scout groups are welcomed throughout the year and members visit local residential care homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 February 1981: Standard registration
- 15 December 2023: Funds received from 297713 FENLAND AND WEST NORFOLK AIRCRAFT PRESERVATION SOC...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Jeffrey Hopkinson | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Ashton Hunt | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Leslie Self | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Johnson | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lester Alec Curtis | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Dawson | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clifford John Fowler | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN PETER BELL | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA VEALE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.40k | £66.65k | £140.19k | £213.19k | £128.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.51k | £59.66k | £69.99k | £117.83k | £134.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £41.35k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH MARCH 1980
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION AN AERONAUTICAL MUSEUM AND FOR THE LIKE PURPOSE TO PROMOTE THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION OF MILITARY AND OTHER AIRCRAFT AND OTHER FORMS OF CONVEYANCE AND PROPULSION, AND EQUIPMENT AND ITEMS OF GENERAL AERONAUTICAL INTEREST OF ACTUAL OR POTENTIAL HISTORIC OR SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE AND EDUCATIVE VALUE AND TO ACQUIRE AIRCRAFT, AIRCRAFT COMPONENTS, AERONAUTICAL EQUIPMENT AND ASSOCIATED ITEMS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CROWGREEN FARM BUNGALOW
LONG STRATTON
NORWICH
NR15 2UZ
- Phone:
- 01508532646
- Email:
- nsam.flixton@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window