READING RETIREMENT CENTRE (F I R T R E E )

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fit,ness in Retirement taking relaxation and exercise. Movement to music.Linedancing Scrabble Lectures Choir Card games Rambles Bowls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Reading
Governance
- 25 August 1981: Standard registration
- F I R T R E E (Working name)
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valarie Beckingham | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Monica Vincent | Trustee | 06 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mark Bowman | Trustee | 01 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.76k | £18.23k | £16.33k | £14.39k | £13.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.79k | £18.61k | £2.73k | £15.43k | £13.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH APRIL 1981
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF RETIRED PERSONS AND THE RELIEF OF THE AGED BY THE PROVISION R ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR RETIRED PERSONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Bath Road
Calcot
READING
RG31 7QH
- Phone:
- 01189427790
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window