Accounts and annual returns ASHAM TRUST

Charity number: 281849
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 23 November 2012 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2011 20 March 2012 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 14 November 2011 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2010 29 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required