EDENBRIDGE TOWN BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Edenbridge Town Band is a brass band. The band performs concerts to the general public It also educates the public in the arts and science and in particular the art and science of music by the presentation of concerts and other activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
- Surrey
Governance
- 11 February 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Crouthers | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN JOHN CROWHURST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID GEORGE POCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.80k | £11.28k | £5.05k | £3.81k | £2.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.39k | £2.27k | £13.13k | £2.50k | £4.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH JANUARY 1981
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
EDENBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 DOVE ROAD
TONBRIDGE
TN10 3JT
- Phone:
- 01732354432
- Email:
- lucy.gibb@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window