Accounts and annual returns HOSPITAL TELEVISION (PORTSMOUTH)

Charity number: 281881
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 17 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 09 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 09 September 2007 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 02 March 2006 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 01 March 2005 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required