Accounts and annual returns PIDLEY CUM FENTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 281888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2024 08 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2023 09 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 04 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 19 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required