Financial history PIDLEY CUM FENTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 281888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £9.16k £22.68k £8.17k £7.38k £6.92k
Total expenditure £5.16k £5.86k £8.38k £9.13k £7.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.71k N/A N/A N/A