Financial history THE TRURO CHORAL SOCIETY (THE TRURO SINGERS)

Charity number: 281902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £47.53k £9.78k £38.14k £30.21k £43.09k
Total expenditure £50.24k £4.91k £22.95k £41.97k £25.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A