THE I T F SEAFARERS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide or assist in providing for the welfare of maritime workers of all nations, and assisting them and their dependents in conditions of sickness, hardship and distress
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,939,500
Donations and legacies | £1.00m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £939.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,958,094
Raising funds | £57.32k | |
Charitable activities | £4.90m | |
Other | £0 |
£2,687,265 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £57.32k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.90m |
People

5 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Abu Dhabi
- Afghanistan
- Ajman
- Akrotiri
- Aland Islands
- Albania
- Algeria
- American Samoa
- Andorra
- Angola
- Anguilla
- Antarctica
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Aruba
- Ascension
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Baker Island
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bonaire
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Bouvet Island
- Brazil
- British Antarctic Territory
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Brunei
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Cayman Islands
- Central African Republic
- Ceuta
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Christmas Island
- Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dhekelia
- Djibouti
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- Dubai
- Easter Island
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Falkland Islands
- Faroe Islands
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- French Guiana
- French Polynesia
- French Southern Territories
- Fujairah
- Gabon
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Greenland
- Grenada
- Guadeloupe
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guernsey
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Heard Island And Mcdonald Islands
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Howland Island
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jarvis Island
- Jersey
- Johnston Atoll
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kingman Reef
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macau
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Malta
- Marshall Islands
- Martinique
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Melilla
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Midway Islands
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- Navassa Island
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Caledonia
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Norfolk Island
- Northern Ireland
- Northern Mariana Islands
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Palmyra Atoll
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Ras Al-khaimah
- Réunion
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Saba
- Saint Barthélemy
- Saint Helena
- Saint-Martin
- Saint Pierre And Miquelon
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- San Marino
- São Tomé And Principe
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Sint Eustatius
- Sint Maarten
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Svalbard And Jan Mayen
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tokelau
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tristan Da Cunha
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- Umm Al-quwain
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- United States Virgin Islands
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Vanuatu
- Vatican City
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Wake Island
- Wallis And Futuna
- Western Sahara
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 20 February 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVE HEINDEL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Maya Schwiegershausen-Guth | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Smith | Trustee | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN MARK COTTON | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN ORRELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PADRAIG JOSEPH CRUMLIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.20m | £490.99k | £1.26m | £1.54m | £1.94m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.82m | £9.15m | £5.63m | £6.20m | £4.96m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.60m | N/A | £1.00m | £1.19m | £1.00m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £600.67k | N/A | £263.86k | £347.20k | £939.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.75m | N/A | £5.57m | £6.14m | £4.90m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £67.92k | N/A | £59.37k | £59.10k | £57.32k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £13.28k | N/A | £13.61k | £15.80k | £18.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £4.08m | N/A | £4.96m | £4.93m | £3.57m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £67.92k | N/A | £59.37k | £59.10k | £57.32k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £11.04k | N/A | £16.93k | £8.59k | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £43.88m | N/A | £46.44m | £35.33m | £35.75m | |
|
Other assets | £5.49m | N/A | £1.32m | £3.65m | £1.51m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.30m | N/A | £3.45m | £3.63m | £2.23m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 December 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 December 2023 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15TH JANUARY 1981 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 4 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY AS AND WHEN THEY SHALL THINK FIT, THE SAME AND THE INCOME THEREOF; (A) IN RELIEVING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND DISABILITY AMONGST SEAFARERS; (B) IN PROMOTING THE SPIRITUAL AND MORAL WELFARE OF SEAFARERS; (C) IN PROVIDING, OR ASSISTING IN PROVIDING, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FACILITIES SERVING INTERNATIONAL PORTS FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR SEAFARERS AND OTHER MARITIME WORKERS OF ALL NATIONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF SUCH SEAFARERS AND OTHER MARITIME WORKERS; (D) IN RELIEVING SEAFARERS' SPOUSES, CIVIL PARTNERS, CHILDREN) WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS AND OTHER DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS; (E) IN ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF SEAFARERS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (F) IN ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OFTHE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ON THE SUBJECT OF SEAFARERS' RIGHTS AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS; AND (G) IN PROMOTING AND PRESERVING THE HEALTH AND SAFETY OF SEAFARERS WITH THE AIM OF PRESERVING LIFE".
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ITF House
49-60 Borough Road
London
- Phone:
- 020 7403 2733
- Email:
- info@seafarerstrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window