THE ICELAND FOODS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation supports the good causes for which Iceland Foods and its employees undertake a wide range of fundraising activities each year. Since 1986 Iceland Foods and the Foundation have together given over GBP9m to charities including Alder Hey Children's Hospital (over GBP3m), Help For Heroes (GBP1.6m), Alzheimer's Research UK (over GBP3.0m) and The Prostate Cancer Charity (over GBP500,000).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income:
£2,585,814
Donations and legacies | £880.39k | |
Charitable activities | £1.56m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £140.72k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,286,994
Raising funds | £959.57k | |
Charitable activities | £1.33m | |
Other | £1.15k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £960.72k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.33m | |
Retained for future use | £298.82k |
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 March 1981: Standard registration
- BEJAM GROUP LIMITED EMPLOYEES TRUST (Previous name)
- THE ICELAND FOODS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE ICELAND FROZEN FOODS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Dhaliwal | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Malcolm Walker | Trustee | 31 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
TARSEM SINGH DHALIWAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIR MALCOLM WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.97m | £365.49k | £958.98k | £1.63m | £2.59m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.57m | £962.55k | £1.65m | £1.38m | £2.29m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.38m | N/A | £319.20k | £592.63k | £880.39k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £559.50k | N/A | £639.66k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £992.37k | £1.56m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £26.88k | N/A | £118 | £49.92k | £140.72k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £319.20k | £592.63k | £880.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.57m | N/A | £1.53m | £1.18m | £1.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | £119.24k | £193.92k | £959.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £1.53m | £1.18m | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £1.15k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £5.06m | N/A | £3.88m | £3.93m | £4.40m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £506.39k | N/A | £610.00k | £400.00k | £569.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH MARCH 1973 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 28TH SEPTEMBER 1989 & 26 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OR IN THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES, CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Second Avenue
Deeside Industrial Park
Deeside
Flintshire
CH5 2NW
- Phone:
- 01244842885
- Email:
- IFCF@Iceland.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window