THE KINGS TAMERTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of premises for charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £1,900 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 05 March 1981: Standard registration
- KINGS TAMERTON COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Hanwell | Chair | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kiera Gillard | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Greep | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANET BOULTON | Trustee | 07 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOY ANGELA DENNIS | Trustee | 12 March 1989 |
|
|
||||
MRS DAWN ORAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.79k | £16.58k | £42.52k | £28.51k | £43.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.79k | £46.77k | £43.81k | £50.38k | £65.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.25k | £14.14k | £17.15k | £800 | £1.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 260 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 260 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1979
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF KINGS TAMERTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
KINGS TAMERTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGS TAMERTON COMMUNITY CENTRE
TREVITHICK ROAD
PLYMOUTH
PL5 2BU
- Phone:
- 01752368442
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window