ROMSEY AMATEUR OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur operatic and dramatic society
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 23 March 1982: Standard registration
- 11 May 2015: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 11 May 2015: Funds transferred to 1161097 ROMSEY AMATEUR OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY (RAOD...
- R A O D S (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2010 | 30/04/2011 | 30/04/2012 | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.16k | £174.95k | £140.41k | £178.39k | £146.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.63k | £147.54k | £134.62k | £163.53k | £139.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | 22 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | 22 November 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2013 | 28 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2013 | 20 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2012 | 01 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2012 | 05 December 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH SEPTEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
(1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS. TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN SAID ARTS. (2) TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window