THE DUBRIS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Main activity is award of annual educational scholarship and minor educational awards. Occasional minor donations to local residents/organisations as need may arise
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Kent
Governance
- 12 February 1981: Standard registration
- THE JAMES AND CECILE JOHNSON CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Elizabeth Angell | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Lamb | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Sherred | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JAMES GIBBONS | Trustee | 03 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.01k | £9.84k | £10.48k | £11.09k | £10.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.64k | £21.15k | £13.64k | £21.23k | £21.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH OCTOBER 1980 as amended on 01 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
TO BE USED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS OF THE FORMER BOROUGH OF DOVER AS CONSTITUTED AND DEFINED IMMEDIATELY PRIOR TO THE 1ST APRIL 1974 AT SUCH TIMES IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Copthorne
Dover Road
Guston
Dover
CT15 5EN
- Phone:
- 01304203548
- Email:
- sherred@invictawiz.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window