Financial history CORNWALL LEUKAEMIA TRUST

Charity number: 281979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £47.16k £28.24k £27.44k £38.67k £38.03k
Total expenditure £44.96k £88.57k £69.95k £82.71k £73.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A