PETERLOO POETS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Peterloo Poets publishes volumes of poetry, runs an annual poetry competition, organises an annual poetry festival, offers poetry workshops to schools & organises regular poetry readings and musical events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- United States
Governance
- 02 April 1981: Standard registration
- 18 May 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HARRY CHAMBERS/PETERLOO POETS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.85k | £104.19k | £113.28k | £97.44k | £81.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.69k | £97.67k | £89.73k | £107.28k | £126.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 21 May 2010 | 110 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 06 April 2009 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 23 April 2009 | 82 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 28 April 2009 | 453 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 06 November 2008 | 280 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 18 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 31 July 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 15 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 18 October 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 13 JUNE 1980 AND AMENDED 1 JULY 200
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN POETRY OF MERIT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE WORKS OF NEW OR NEGLECTED POETS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window