Accounts and annual returns BRITISH-AMERICAN ARTS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity Number: 282014
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 06 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 30 April 2009 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 30 April 2009 89 days late
Annual return 31 March 2007 28 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 28 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 24 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 24 January 2007 On Time