FARNHAM CLASSIC CONCERTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of Farnham Classic Concerts is to promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of chamber and other music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 05 March 1981: Standard registration
- 06 March 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE FARNHAM AND BOURNE MUSIC CLUB (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2007 | 31/05/2008 | 31/05/2009 | 31/05/2010 | 31/05/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.56k | £7.88k | £7.65k | £6.05k | £5.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.49k | £8.31k | £8.21k | £6.96k | £6.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2011 | 12 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2010 | 08 February 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2009 | 29 March 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2008 | 25 August 2009 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2008 | 21 July 2009 | 112 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH JANUARY 1981 AS AMENDED 13TH JUNE 1990 & 4TH APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHAMBER AND OTHER MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC PROFFESSIONAL CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHERS WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window