EUGENE VINAVER FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Vinaver Trust offers grants to aid the publication of scholarly works in the field of Arthurian studies. It also offers grants for postgraduate study for research degrees under the terms of the Barron Bequest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Belgium
- France
- Germany
- Ireland
- Italy
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Spain
- Switzerland
Governance
- 31 March 1981: Standard registration
- VINAVER TRUST (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR JANE HILARY MARGARET TAYLOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Megan Leitch | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Almut Maria Vera Suerbaum | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Corin Ferrand Vanner Corley | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CAROLYNE LARRINGTON | Trustee | 20 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr GEOFFREY NORMAN BROMILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR AD PUTTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR CERIDWEN LLOYD-MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.07k | £3.92k | £3.05k | £2.51k | £2.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £581 | £3.86k | £1.29k | £3.32k | £3.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30/01/1981
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LIFE AND TIMES OF KING ARTHUR THROUGH HISTORICAL AND ARCHAEOLOGICAL RESEARCH AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 ALBERT STREET
DURHAM
DH1 4RJ
- Phone:
- 01913868898
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window