LYNG VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lyng Village Hall is situated in the village of East Lyng, The trustees organise and run events that serve the wider local community, in the villages surrounding Lyng open to anyone wishing to attend, including Outwood & Durston . The location of the hall means that we can also serve other outlying villages, who no longer have a village hall, It is also available for private hire and use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 29 April 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Debra Bushell Gould | Chair | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Anne Naylor | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Naylor | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Russell Kent | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marion Nicol | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Bale | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Perry | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.47k | £1.07k | £4.17k | £12.07k | £8.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £579 | £783 | £2.04k | £12.27k | £9.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.14k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 March 2025 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 1LTH FEBRUARY 1981 as amended on 21 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LYNG AND DURSTON IN THE COUNTY OF SOMERSET WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LYNG
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lyng Village Hall
Main Road
East Lyng
Taunton
Somerset
- Phone:
- 07860135751
- Email:
- Lyngvillagehall@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window