Financial history SALISBURY AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 282088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £808 £4.91k £1.72k £895 £1.11k
Total expenditure £1.19k £967 £1.24k £953 £1.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A