Financial history GREAT YARMOUTH AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 282099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.34k £9.55k £6.42k £290 £2.15k
Total expenditure £2.27k £6.08k £4.68k £245 £2.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A