GREAT YARMOUTH AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide weekly recordings of the local newspaper and other items of interest for access by blind and visually handicapped persons in the Great Yarmouth area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 15 April 1981: Standard registration
- GRAPEVINE (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DESNE CLARKE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Margaret Anne Colman | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHAUN MCGARRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN KEABLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Graham Walter Gooda | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.34k | £9.55k | £6.42k | £290 | £2.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.27k | £6.08k | £4.68k | £245 | £2.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 March 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 295 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND FEBRUARY 1981
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND OR THE PARIALLY SIGHTED OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OF PERMANENT INCAPACITY OF DISABLILTY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
GREAT YARMOUTH AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 The Old Exchange
Crowfoot Gardens
BECCLES
Suffolk
NR34 9UA
- Phone:
- 07717488781
- Email:
- admin@grapevinegy.org
- Website:
-
grapevinegy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window