CROSSROADS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CROSSROADS CARE IS THE UMBRELLA ORGANISATION FOR 96 LOCAL SCHEMES ACROSS ENGLAND, WALES AND ISLE OF MAN. SCHEMES PROVIDE DIRECT SERVICES TO CARERS, IMPROVING THE LIVES OF CARERS BY GIVING THEM TIME TO BE THEMSELVES AND HAVE A BREAK FROM THEIR CARING RESPONSIBILITIES. THE AIM IS TO PROVIDE A RELIABLE SERVICE, TAILORED TO MEET THE INDIVIDUAL NEEDS OF EACH CARER AND THE PERSON THEY ARE CARING FOR.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 April 1981: Standard registration
- CROSSROADS ASSOCIATION (NATIONAL) (Working name)
- CROSSROADS CARE (Working name)
- CROSSROADS CARING FOR CARERS (Working name)
- ASSOCIATION OF CROSSROADS CARE ATTENDANT SCHEMES LIMITED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Richard Corry | Chair | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS AND BENEFICIARIES; AND TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES WHICH OPERATE FOR THE CARE AND SUPPORT OF CARERS AND BENEFICIARIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 1I, Valiant Office Suites
Lumonics House
Valley Drive
Swift Valley Industrial Estate
Rugby
CV21 1TQ
- Phone:
- 03007729600
- Email:
- info@carers.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window