STELLA AND VICTOR BRUSA MEMORIAL FUND FOR CHILDREN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 May 1981: Standard registration
- 13 March 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- STELLA AND VICTOR BRUSA MEMORIAL FUND (Working name)
- VICTOR BRUSA MEMORIAL FUND FOR CHILDREN (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £259 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 01 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH JULY 1980
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE WANT AND POVERTY AMONGST DEPRIVED CHILDREN IN THE U.K. AND ELSEWHERE WITHOUT REGARD TO THEIR RACE COLOUR OR RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR WITHOUT DEROGATING FROM THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO ARRANGE AND PAY THE COSTS OF PROVIDING HOLIDAYS AND HOLIDAY ACCOMODATION FOR SUCH CHILDREN IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE NSPCC OR ANY SIMILAR CHARITABLE ORGANISATION OR ORGANISATIONS. TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHERLEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AS THE TRUSTEES BEING NOT LESS THAN THREE IN NUMBER SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BY DEED EXECUTED WITH THEIR UNANIMOUS CONSENT DECLARE.
Area of benefit
IN THE U.K. AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window