Governing document THE COLERIDGE BUS
Charity Number: 282151

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/07/1978 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/1980 AS AMENDED ON 12/06/1987 AS AMENDED ON 28/07/1989 AS AMENDED ON 19/09/1996 AS AMENDED ON 07/05/1997 AS AMENDED ON 22/08/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ON A NON-PROFIT-MAKING BASIS REGULAR AND SCHEDULED PUBLIC TRANSPORT SERVING RURAL PARISHES EAST OF KINGSBRIDGE AND SOUTH OF DARTMOUTH, AND TO RAISE AND MANAGE FUNDS FOR THIS PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISHES EAST OF KINGSBRIDGE AND SOUTH OF DARTMOUTH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.