Financial history AL QURAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 282162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.83k £12.79k £10.27k £2.78k £4.31k
Total expenditure £10.20k £7.87k £5.00k £2.05k £14.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A