THE GLYN SCHOOL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of Glyn School Trust is to rovide Glyn schoolwith additional educational facilities and supplies. It may also support other charitable purposes as the Trustees may determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 April 1981: Standard registration
- 21 March 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.97k | £640 | £2.49k | £0 | £5.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.38k | £22.07k | £30.00k | £2.37k | £15.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 30 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 26 March 2018 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 16 March 2017 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH FEBRUARY 1981
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT GLYN SCHOOL IN EWELL IN THE COUNTY OF SURREY BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. (B) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window