THE OXFORDSHIRE BUILDINGS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve for the benefit of the people of Oxfordshire and of the nation at large, whatever of the English historical, architectural and constructional heritage may exist in Oxfordshire in the form of buildings and also any garden or plant or machinery irrespective of whether it is associated with a building of particular beauty or historical, or architectural, or constructional interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,109 from 1 government contract(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 10 June 1981: Standard registration
- THE OXFORDSHIRE BUILDINGS TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Bretherton | Chair | 01 June 2010 |
|
|||||||
Susanna Pressel | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
Mary Clarkson | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
John Howson | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Roger Michael Thomas | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Anne Purse | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Glynis Phillips | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|||||||
Dr Elizabeth Margaret Embree Poskitt | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|||||||
Trevor Brown | Trustee | 12 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||
GRANT AUDLEY-MILLER | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||
BRIAN BOWRAN WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SALLY JANE STRADLING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
WINIFRED LESLEY LEGGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN EDMUND GRIFFIN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
CAROL ANDERSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.92k | £14.09k | £32.05k | £14.36k | £33.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.62k | £580 | £398 | £25.88k | £18.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £8.11k | N/A | £8.11k | £8.11k | £8.11k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 29 DEC 2021
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THEPEOPLE OF OXFORDSHIRE AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, WHATEVER OF THE ENGLISH HISTORICAL , ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN OXFORDSHIRE IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS AND ALSO ANY GARDEN O RPLANT OR MACHINERY IRRESPECTIVE OF WHETHER IT IS ASSOCIATIED WITHA BILDING OF PARTIUCLAR BEUATY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL, OR CONSTURCTIONAL INTEREST OR ANCIENT MONUMENT.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAYCOT
CHURCH CLOSE
FARMOOR
OXFORD
OX2 9NP
- Phone:
- 01865862148
- Email:
- johnhay.griffin@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window