Financial history THE FIRTREE TRUST

Charity number: 282239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £7.46k £7.01k £5.08k £9.28k £6.04k
Total expenditure £9.79k £5.94k £15.42k £17.96k £10.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A