Accounts and annual returns FLEETVILLE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 282259
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2019 05 October 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 05 October 2020 127 days late
Annual return 31 July 2018 27 November 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 27 November 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2017 27 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 27 May 2018 On Time