THE NORTH WEST FRIENDS OF HOMOEOPATHY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
No change
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 17 June 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
INA RUTH WHIELDON | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr HUGH JOHN NIELSEN | Trustee | 23 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £259 | £135 | £37 | £25 | £155 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.33k | £10.23k | £0 | £10.00k | £11.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 August 2022 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 June 2021 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 March 2021 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 4TH DECEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY HOMOEOPATHIC MEDICINE. THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE BRANCH OF MEDICINE KNOWN AS HOMOEOPATHIC MEDICINE AND TO ASSIST IN RESEARCH OF HOMOEOPATHIC MEDICINE, THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH BEING DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 MONTCLAIR DRIVE
LIVERPOOL
L18 0HA
- Phone:
- 07885931027
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window