Financial history HORSHAM UNIT 186 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 282285
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.68k £5.14k £2.01k £0 £0
Total expenditure £14.48k £2.02k £4.92k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A