Financial history CLIVE PARE MEMORIAL FUND

Charity Number: 282317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £2.59k £2.67k £2.67k £3.84k £2.13k
Total expenditure £2.46k £2.80k £2.80k £3.07k £2.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A