Financial history LONIA LIMITED

Charity number: 282336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.89m £2.06m £1.96m £3.57m £3.88m
Total expenditure £2.52m £2.36m £2.61m £3.58m £3.62m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £1.28m £1.00m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.89m £2.06m £1.96m £2.29m £2.88m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.95m £2.10m £2.43m £3.21m £3.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £574.96k £258.52k £181.26k £378.72k £411.01k
Expenditure - Governance £1.80k £1.80k £2.00k £2.00k £12.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.94m £2.10m £2.42m £3.20m £3.20m
Expenditure - Investment management £574.96k £258.52k £181.26k £378.72k £411.01k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0