Financial history ALMAT LIMITED

Charity number: 282351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £57.84k £63.21k £47.32k £74.64k £64.60k
Total expenditure £37.88k £51.27k £30.90k £50.91k £52.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A