METROPOLITAN POLICE STAFF WELFARE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides financial assistance to serving and former members of the Metropolitan Police Staff and Mayor's Office for Policing and Crime and their families or dependants who are in need as a result of poverty, sickness, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 May 1981: Standard registration
- METROPOLITAN POLICE STAFF WELFARE FUND (Working name)
- METROPOLITAN POLICE CIVIL STAFF WELFARE FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Oliffe | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Davies | Trustee | 27 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Viv Danvers | Trustee | 24 July 2017 |
|
|||||
VALARIE HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.63k | £20.25k | £20.48k | £23.55k | £29.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.25k | £14.48k | £26.50k | £24.15k | £27.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26/03/1981 AS AMENDED ON 01/06/1981 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26/09/1983 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17/05/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO MEMBERS AND PAST MEMBERS OF THE METROPOLITAN POLICE CIVIL STAFF AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS WHO THROUGH POVERTY HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS ARE IN NEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MPS Charities Section
2nd Floor (South)
Kilburn Police Station
38 Salusbury Road
NW6 6LT
- Phone:
- 02071610265
- Email:
- welfarefunds@met.police.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window