Accounts and annual returns MENDLESHAM COMMUNITY CHARITY

Charity number: 282391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 21 June 2024 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required