Accounts and annual returns Sharnbrook PrimaryPTA

Charity number: 282396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 13 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 14 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 07 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required