THE YATELEY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Yateley Society is the civic amenity society for the Civil Parish Of Yateley, and is registered with The Civic Voice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
Governance
- 07 July 1981: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Hewitt | Chair | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ferriss | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Gardner | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hesketh | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jo Hill | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Liz Carpenter | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin Broadley | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROGER IVAN COOMBES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.28k | £3.09k | £5.35k | £5.71k | £3.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.74k | £5.62k | £6.85k | £4.52k | £8.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH JANUARY 1981 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION PASSED AT AGM 31 JANUARY 1985; AND AMENDED AT SGM OF 14 NOVEMBER 1996 AND AGM OF 20 FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED AT AGM ON 15.2.01. as amended on 03 Nov 2022 as amended on 03 Nov 2022 as amended on 03 Nov 2022 as amended on 07 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
1. To educate the public in the geography, history, natural history, and architecture of the area of benefit. 2. To secure the preservation, protection, development, and improvement of features of historic or public interest in the area of benefit. 3. To promote high standards of planning and architecture in or affecting the area of benefit. 4. To secure the enhancement of the biological diversity of the ecosystems, the conservation of the natural and semi-natural habitats, and the protection of the characteristic flora and fauna within the area of benefit 5. To protect, preserve and improve the environment for the public in the area of benefit by, for example: a. facilitating the repair of broken or damaged items for reuse and the recycling or redistribution of surplus materials for use elsewhere; and b. advancing education about all aspects of waste generation, management, recycling and reuse and other environmental topics including, but not limited to: biodiversity loss; climate change; sustainable living and the climate and ecological emergency.
Area of benefit
YATELEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
32
Lawford Crescent
Yateley
Hampshire
GU46 6JU
- Phone:
- 07793820742
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window