Accounts and annual returns GUILDFORD ACADEMIC ASSOCIATES

Charity number: 282409
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2013 25 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2012 29 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 29 November 2012 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2011 19 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 19 December 2011 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2010 25 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required