BINSTEAD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Binstead and the neighbourhood thereof without distinction of sex or of political or other opinions by associating the Local Authorities Voluntary Organisations and the inhabitants of the area of benefit in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 07 July 1981: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMAN BAYES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.28k | £36.03k | £20.66k | £32.94k | £33.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.91k | £20.87k | £21.81k | £28.07k | £26.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2025 | 371 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/01/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/11/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25/11/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BINSTEAD IN THE ISLE OF WIGHT AND NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS OF BINSTEAD IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTOF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR INHABITANTS. 2) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
BINSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BINSTEAD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
CONISTON AVENUE
RYDE
PO33 3SB
- Phone:
- 01983 614543
- Email:
- green69sarah@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window