Financial history SINDHI ASSOCIATION OF UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 282447
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.26k £12.28k £17.89k £12.25k £14.30k
Total expenditure £7.02k £6.08k £21.97k £23.20k £24.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.28k £12.48k N/A N/A