SINDHI ASSOCIATION OF UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary objective is to promote Sindhi Culture
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 May 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sonia Dembla | Trustee | 30 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Haresh Lahori | Trustee | 30 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shalini Dhanjani | Trustee | 30 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gul Chugani | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Umesh Daswani | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nanik Mulchandani | Trustee | 25 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHANDRU GIDOOMAL | Trustee | 15 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
BHAGWAN KHEMCHAND MIRCHANDANI | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr CHANDRU MALKANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GUL MULCHANDANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS ANJIE BHARWANEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAL LALWANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANIL SHIVDASANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MURLI MUKHEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KISHEN RAMCHANDANI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.26k | £12.28k | £17.89k | £12.25k | £14.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.02k | £6.08k | £21.97k | £23.20k | £24.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.28k | £12.48k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2022 | 172 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 411 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD APRIL 1981
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE SINDHI HINDU FAITH. 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG THE MEMBERS OF COMMUNITY. 3. TO EDUCATE THE MEMBERS OF COMMUNITY. 4. TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF RESEARCH IN THE SINDHI LANGUAGE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
230a Kenton Road
Harrow
HA3 8BY
- Phone:
- 02089092151
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window